U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00006-10
  • Case Name: USA v. Phillips et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
  • April 15, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 14, 2025: [Order]
  • April 14, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 08, 2025: [Notice of Intent to Change Plea]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: [Order]
  • March 24, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • March 24, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order]
  • March 18, 2025: [Petition for Action - PS8 (MJ) - Request No Action]
  • March 13, 2025: [Hearing ]
  • March 12, 2025: [Docket Annotation re Wrong Event Selected]
  • March 11, 2025: [Status Report]
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Unopposed Motion]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • October 10, 2024: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 04, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.