U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00231
  • Case Name: Kone v. Baker
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 25, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 25, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 25, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 23, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 21, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 16, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • April 16, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 16, 2025: [Entry of Default]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 10, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 08, 2025: [Supplement]
  • April 04, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Declaration]
  • March 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • March 28, 2025: [Supplement]
  • March 24, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • March 18, 2025: [Reconsideration]
  • March 18, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address]
October, 2024
  • October 09, 2024: [Notice (Other)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.