U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. McAtee et al.
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Expedite ]
  • April 30, 2025: [Continue]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Unopposed Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Unopposed Motion]
  • April 24, 2025: [Dismiss ]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Set/Reset Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • April 22, 2025: [Final Presentence Investigation Report]
  • April 21, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 21, 2025: [Clerks Notice]
  • April 21, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Scheduling Order]
  • March 26, 2025: [Status Conference]
  • March 26, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 26, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2024: [Expedite ]
  • October 11, 2024: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • October 11, 2024: [Order Setting Hearing on Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Response in Opposition]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.