U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 24-00181
  • Case Name: Venessa Marie Brazfield
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Postpetition Mortgage Fees, Expenses, and Charges (Form 410S2)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
February, 2025
  • February 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
October, 2024
  • October 14, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Request for Notice by Creditor]
  • October 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • October 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • October 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • October 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • October 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • October 11, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.