U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00035
  • Case Name: Kent L. Tompkins
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Vacating Order (SA)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Dismissing Case (SA)]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Intent to Deny]
  • March 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Stipulation]
December, 2024
  • December 23, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • December 13, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Response / Reply (Generic - use when specific response event not listed)]
October, 2024
  • October 25, 2024: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Under Advisement Deadline & Flag]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.