U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00003
  • Case Name: Miranda Celeste Mayfield
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Update Debtor Information]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Change of Address]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
March, 2025
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Relief from Stay]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of No Objection]
January, 2025
  • January 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.