U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00007
  • Case Name: Payton Elizabeth Green and Jolina Anne Tapec Patao
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order of Discharge]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Discharging Debtor(s) - Ch 7, Ch 12 & Ch 13 Standard (SA) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • April 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Requirement RE: Financial Management Course - Ch 7, 11 & 13 (BNC Notice)]
March, 2025
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Proceeding Memo]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Regarding Reaffirmation Agreement (CM37-COAafter) (SA)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
February, 2025
  • February 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Receipt]
  • February 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Audio File (Active Event)]
January, 2025
  • January 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Show Cause (with hrg) (SA)]
  • January 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • January 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • January 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.