U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00027
  • Case Name: Kevin Stuart Freeman and Gaynor Anne Freeman
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 02, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Confirming Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN01) (SA)]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan Recommendation]
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • March 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • March 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • March 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • March 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.