U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 23-00041
  • Case Name: Miss Brenda LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Order Due (Sets and Removes Order Due Flags and Deadlines)]
  • March 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Ch 11 SubchV Trustee's Report of No Distribution B - case dism or conv, fee award recd]
  • March 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Dismiss Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.