U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00030
  • Case Name: Rebecca Ellen Sparks
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN04)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • April 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Request for Special Notice]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Generic Motion / Application]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 12, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.