U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00031
  • Case Name: Gene Bradley Letts, Jr.
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Service]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing With Objection Deadline]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
March, 2025
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (With Db Atty) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 15, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF38)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.