U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:23-cv-00272
  • Case Name: Land et al v. Matanuska-Susitna Borough School District et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
  • April 30, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Appear]
  • April 21, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 11, 2025: [1 - Set/Reset Hearings (Private Entry)]
  • April 11, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Stipulation]
  • March 17, 2025: [Stipulation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.