U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00033
  • Case Name: Kevin Richard Bond
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Final Decree & Close Bankruptcy Case]
  • April 16, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Dismissal]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice (BNC Notice)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Trustees Final Report and Account]
March, 2025
  • March 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Dismissing Case (SA)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Dismiss Case (No Hrg Rqd for Ch 13, Hrg Rqd for Ch 7,11,12 - FRBP2002(a)(4)) (CM15)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAwith) (SA)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.