U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00032
  • Case Name: OneTree LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 14, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Employ (CM41)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors Continued (pro-memo)]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
March, 2025
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Corporation) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 17, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.