U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00034
  • Case Name: Fautua Fautua and Repeka Fautua
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
March, 2025
  • March 26, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF38)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • March 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.