U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cv-00053
  • Case Name: Wood v. International Brotherhood of Teamsters et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 18, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 16, 2025: [Order]
  • April 16, 2025: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • April 16, 2025: [Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 15, 2025: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • April 01, 2025: [Declaration]
  • April 01, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
March, 2025
  • March 19, 2025: [Amended Minute Entry]
  • March 18, 2025: [Scheduling Conference]
  • March 18, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.