U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00035
  • Case Name: Marilou G. Blanco
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Financial Management Course Certificate]
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution - No Funds (BKTR01)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Undeliverable Mail]
March, 2025
  • March 31, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • March 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Waive Filing Fee (BKO01)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Waive Chapter 7 Filing Fee (Form 103B) (BKM01)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.