U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00036
  • Case Name: Miss Brenda, LLC
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Operating Report]
  • May 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Order on Application to Employ Nunc Pro Tunc]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Certificate of No Objection]
  • April 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Proceeding Memo]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Approve Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Approve Stipulation (Not Rule 9019)]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Stipulation]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Audio File (Active Event)]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Generic Notice (NOT to be used if setting a deadline)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Relief from Stay]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Certificate of No Objection]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Certificate of Service]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Initial Status Conference Report (Ch 11 Subchapter V)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Amended Schedules A/B C G H I J (no fee)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Certificate of Service]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Declaration]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Employ Nunc Pro Tunc (CM41)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Motion / Application (To Set Obj Deadline)]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Declaration]
  • April 04, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Relief from Stay (Fee) (CM03)]
  • April 03, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Approving Stipulation (SA)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Approve Stipulation (Not Rule 9019)]
  • April 01, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Stipulation]
March, 2025
  • March 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [QC Remark (generic)]
  • March 27, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Joint Administration]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • March 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Declaration]
  • March 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Joint Administration]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • March 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • March 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Appear pro hac vice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Generic Motion]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Declaration]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Tax Documents (Viewing of Document Restricted)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Meeting of Creditors Ch 11 (Corporation / Partnership) (BNC Notice)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Notice of Appointment of Ch 11 Trustee (BKTR03)]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Entry of Appearance]
  • March 20, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Good Standing]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Generic Motion / Application]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Generic Motion / Application]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [OSC Referral]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [OSC Referral]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [QC Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [QC Deficiency Notice Re: Fees]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Petition Review Completed]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Update Deadline (Compliance Deadlines)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Update Deadline (Compliance Deadlines)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Initial Scheduling Order for Small Business Debtor Under Subchapter V (SA)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Initial Scheduling Order for Small Business Debtor Under Subchapter V (SA)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 Trustee: Groshong, Geoff [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Active Event)]
  • March 19, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.