U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:24-cr-00127-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Lopez-Chavez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 21, 2025: [Discovery Management Conference]
  • April 21, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Waiver of Presence at Arraignment]
  • April 18, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 18, 2025: [Order]
  • April 18, 2025: [1 - Terminate Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 28, 2025: [Hearing ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.