U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:25-cv-00007
  • Case Name: Williams v. Anderson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • April 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • April 18, 2025: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • April 09, 2025: [Response to Motion (Non-Opposition)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 07, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 07, 2025: [Amend/Correct]
  • April 04, 2025: [Dismiss]
  • April 04, 2025: [Notice of Appearance]
  • April 02, 2025: [1 - Summons Issued]
  • April 02, 2025: [Unissued Summons]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.