U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00049
  • Case Name: Julie Johnson
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [341 Meeting of Creditors CONCLUDED (All Chapters)]
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 29, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Matrix]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Chapter 13 Plan (BKPLAN02)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Affidavit of Service]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Declaration Regarding Debtor's Schedules (Form 106Dec or Form 202 )]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Summary of Assets and Liabilities (Form 106Sum and 206Sum)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 22, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Emergency/Ex parte Motion Referral]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Extend Time]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Ch 13 Statement of Monthly Income (Form 122C-1)/Calculation of Disposable Income (Form 122C-2)]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Receipt of Installment Payment (Use FINAL if this payment will pay off balance)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 09, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Setting Ch 13 Confirmation Hearing (Pro Se) (Chambers Template-BNC Notice) (SA)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)]
  • April 08, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtors Prior Filings (Active Event)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Statement Concerning Payment Advices (LBF38)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certification of Domestic Support Payments]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • April 07, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.