U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cv-00072
  • Case Name: Jensen et al v. Leventhal Lewis Kuhn Taylor Swan PC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice of Lodging State Court Document(s)]
  • April 29, 2025: [Order]
  • April 28, 2025: [Response in Opposition to Motion]
  • April 28, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 23, 2025: [Order]
  • April 23, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Service List]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Settlement]
  • April 16, 2025: [Remand to State Court]
  • April 14, 2025: [Initial Case Status Report Order]
  • April 09, 2025: [Order to Petitioner Subsequent to Removal]
  • April 09, 2025: [Clerks Notice]
  • April 09, 2025: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.