U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00052
  • Case Name: Monica A Meder
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • April 30, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Terminate Deadline]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Verification of Creditor Mailing Matrix (LBF40)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • April 28, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Payment Advices (Pay Stubs)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Ch 7 Stmt of Monthly Income Form 122A-1 / Stmt of Exemption Form 122A-1Supp / Means Test Form 122A-2]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107 & 207)]
  • April 25, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Schedules A-J]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 13, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Declaration Re: Electronic Filing (LBF37)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 7 - No Asset (Individual / Joint) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 7) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Petition Review Completed]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • April 11, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 Trustee: Jipping_7, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
  • April 10, 2025: bk Office: 3 Chapter: 7 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 7) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.