U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 25-00055
  • Case Name: Genevieve Ann Casey
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 08, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Flag Utility to Set or Remove ANY Flag]
  • May 06, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Show Cause for Dismissal of Case (with hrg) (CM48-COAwith) (SA)]
  • May 05, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [OSC Referral]
April, 2025
  • April 24, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Debtor DeBN Account]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 23, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Entry of Appearance]
  • April 21, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - UST Notice of Standing Motion]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Duties of Debtor]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors]
  • April 20, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Meeting of Creditors Ch 13 (BNC Notice)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Appointment of Trustee (Ch 7, 12, or 13 only)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of Debtor Duties (Ch 13 Individual) (BNC Notice)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Notice of US Trustee Standing Motion to Dismiss (BNC Notice)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fees in Installments (BKO01)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Petition Review Completed]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Update Deadline (Initial Deadlines / Schedules & Statements)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [SSN, Tax ID or EIN Review Complete]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Debtor Electronic Noticing Request (DeBN) (LBF41)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Debtor Electronic Noticing Request (DeBN) (LBF41)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Certificate of Credit Counseling (Pre-Petition Counseling)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Pay Filing Fee in Installments (Form 103A) (BKM01)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 Trustee: Jipping_13, Nacole M. [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
  • April 18, 2025: bk Office: 1 Chapter: 13 [Voluntary Petition (Chapter 13) (Active Event)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.