U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Alaska

alaska Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Alaska
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 3:25-cr-00029-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Woods
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Notice (Other)]
  • April 28, 2025: [Warrant Returned Executed]
  • April 25, 2025: [Order of Detention]
  • April 25, 2025: [Detention Hearing]
  • April 25, 2025: [Arraignment]
  • April 25, 2025: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • April 25, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 23, 2025: [Pretrial Services Report]
  • April 22, 2025: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing]
  • April 22, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued ]
  • April 22, 2025: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • April 21, 2025: [Notice of Defendant in State Custody]
  • April 21, 2025: [Indictment - For Public]
  • April 21, 2025: [Indictment (Unredacted-Not for Public)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.