open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-bk-12066-
    Party Name:DIANA LYNN ORTIZ
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL)]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [UST Review of Chapter 7 Trustee Final Report and Applic of Trustee to be Discharged (batch)]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Report of Final Account and Distribution and Application to be Discharged(batch)]
    Date Published:May 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [oTrustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Report of No Objection]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:November 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [UST Review of Chapter 7 Trustee Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation (batch)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Final Report and Account (Chapter 7) (batch)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [Trustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FLORES, CONSTANTINO [BNC Form Request--Chapter 7 Discharge]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?679434
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =