open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-bk-17092-
    Party Name:LAUREN ASHLEY KOLB
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL)]
    Date Published:December 07, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [UST Review of Chapter 7 Trustee Final Report and Applic of Trustee to be Discharged (batch)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Report of Final Account and Distribution and Application to be Discharged(batch)]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [oPay Unclaimed Funds to Court]
    Date Published:October 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Receipt for Unclaimed Funds or Dividends to the Court]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684767
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =