open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:14-bk-17103-
    Party Name:Jami Dedmon and Corey Dedmon
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MILLS, GAYLE ESKAY [oTrustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
    Date Published:July 24, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MILLS, GAYLE ESKAY [Trustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MILLS, GAYLE ESKAY [oRuling on Objection to Claim]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MILLS, GAYLE ESKAY [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MILLS, GAYLE ESKAY [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
    Date Published:June 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MILLS, GAYLE ESKAY [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684779
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =