open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-bk-17124-
    Party Name:RICHARD F. SCIBETTA, JR.
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [UST Review of Chapter 7 Trustee Final Report and Applic of Trustee to be Discharged (batch)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Report of Final Account and Distribution and Application to be Discharged(batch)]
    Date Published:April 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [oTrustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Report of No Objection]
    Date Published:March 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [UST Review of Chapter 7 Trustee Final Report (batch)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation (batch)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Final Report and Account (Chapter 7) (batch)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Trustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [oPayment of Administrative Expenses]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Payment of Administrative Expenses (Motion for)]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [oCompensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee (Application for)]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Bar Date (negative notice) (Notice of)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee (Application for)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 09, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [zNotice of Claims Bar Date and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [oVacating Hearing]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Virtual Minute Entry]
    Date Published:October 06, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:October 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Request to Set Claims Bar Date (batch)]
    Date Published:October 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [oFRBP 2004 Examination (Application for)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [2004 Examination (Notice of)]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Reply]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [oApprove Compromise/Settlement]
    Date Published:August 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Hearing (Notice of)]
    Date Published:August 26, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Approve Compromise/Settlement (Motion to)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Chapter 7 Trustee Notice to be Mailed to All Creditors ]
    Date Published:July 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: FORD, JILL H. [Meeting of Creditors 7 (No Asset)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684805
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =