open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-ap-00728-
    Party Name:Vicari et al v. MC LAUGHLIN et al
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Entry of Judgment / Order (Adv Form)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oJudgment]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Virtual Minute Entry]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oContinuing/Rescheduling]
    Date Published:November 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:July 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Response]
    Date Published:July 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?680917
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =