open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:4:16-bk-01061-
    Party Name:ANDREAS JASON PASQUAL
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Final Report - Dismissed Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Dismissal Order and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oDismissing Case - VAN Form]
    Date Published:May 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Trustee Request to Dismiss Case For Failure to Appear at Meeting of Creditors (batch)]
    Date Published:May 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Withdrawal of Claim]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oRelief from Stay]
    Date Published:April 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Continuance of Meeting of Creditors]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:March 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Relief from Stay (Motion for) (176.00 fee)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Plan and Notice of Date to File Objection]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Order]
    Date Published:March 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Objection to Exempt Property (batch)]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Set Aside (Motion to)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oExtend Time to File Schedules, Stmts, Declarations, Plan or MML (Form)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Extend Time to File Chapter 13 Plan (Motion to)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Calculation of Disposable Income 122C-2]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Chapter 13 Statement of Monthly Income 122C-1]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Declaration of Evidence of Employer Payments]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [AA Schedules and Statements (Formerly All Required)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Credit Counseling Certificate (Include any Debt Repayment Plan)]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [zNotice of Meeting of Creditors and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:February 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Hearing - VAN Form]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Financial Management Course Due (Form)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [BNC Form Request--341 Notice--Chapter 13 (Initial)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [1Statement of Social Security Number]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Initial Mailing List]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Debtor's Prior Filings]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice of Ineligibility for Discharge]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Receipt for Petition Filing Fee (New Case)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Meeting of Creditors 13]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Notice to Pro Se Debtors Form]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Deficiency Notice to Debtor (Missing Documents Form)]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [4Chapter 13 Voluntary Petition]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL) (DISMISSED)]
    Date Published:October 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [oDismiss Case for Failure of Debtor to Provide Requested Tax Information]
    Date Published:August 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Dismiss Case for Failure of Debtor to Provide Requested Tax Information (Motion to)]
    Date Published:June 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 4 Chapter: 13 Trustee: KERNS, DIANNE C. [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684143
Post Your Comment or Question
5 x 1 =