open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:13-bk-02116-
    Party Name:REGENCY REALTY INVESTMENTS II, LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Assignment/Transfer of Claim (or Notice of) (25.00 fee)]
    Date Published:October 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Appearance (Notice of)]
    Date Published:September 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [oFinal Decree]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Virtual Minute Entry]
    Date Published:December 22, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [oAccelerate/Expedite]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Accelerate/Expedite (Motion to)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Final Decree (Motion for)]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Post-Confirmation Report]
    Date Published:October 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Mailing]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?643397
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 1 =