open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:11-bk-02400-
    Party Name:DANIEL SCHREINER and GLENDA SCHREINER
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [zDischarge of Debtor and Certificate of Notice (DO NOT USE)]
    Date Published:January 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Close Chapter 11 Case - Final Decree]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Form Request--Chapter 11 Discharge (Individual)]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [oFinal Decree (Does Not Close Case)]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Order]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Response]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Certificate of Service]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Post-Confirmation Report]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Objection]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Approve (Motion to)]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:September 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:July 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 3 Chapter: 11 [Operating Report]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?645591
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =