open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:12-bk-24242-
    Party Name:Strata Title, LLC
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Notice of Exhibits Intent to Dispose]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL)]
    Date Published:February 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [UST Review of Chapter 7 Trustee Final Report and Applic of Trustee to be Discharged (batch)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Report of Final Account and Distribution and Application to be Discharged(batch)]
    Date Published:January 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [oTrustee Application for Compensation (Chapter 7 or 11)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Report of No Objection]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Trustee Notice of Lodging Proposed Order]
    Date Published:December 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Certificate of Service and No Objections]
    Date Published:December 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Notice of Trustee's Final Report and Applications for Compensation]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Compensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee (Application for)]
    Date Published:November 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Notice of Hearing - VAN Form (PS)]
    Date Published:September 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [oSubstitute Attorney]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Entry (Notice of)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Substitute Attorney (Motion to)]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [oGranting]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Substitution of Attorney (Notice of)]
    Date Published:March 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [oOther Order to be Mailed to Interested Parties by BNC]
    Date Published:December 31, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:November 18, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Notice of Rescheduled Hearing Form]
    Date Published:November 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Change of Address]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Hearing on Objection (Notice of)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Reply]
    Date Published:November 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Objection]
    Date Published:October 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:October 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [oCompensation by Professional Employed by Chapter 7 or 11 Trustee (Application for)]
    Date Published:August 05, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: ANDERSON, DINA [Pre-Trial Statement]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?637787
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 2 =