open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-bk-16665-
    Party Name:HAROLD R. HALMAN, III and LISA M. HALMAN
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Stipulation]
    Date Published:May 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL)]
    Date Published:February 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Chapter 7 Trustee's Report of No Distribution]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Auto-Docket of Credit Card Payment]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Amendment to Schedules (D,E,F/30.00 Fee)]
    Date Published:October 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Bankruptcy, Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: HALEY, ERIC M. [Adversary Proceeding Opened]
    Date Published:November 17, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?684315
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 1 =