open-public-records

U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Bankruptcy Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-ap-00890-
    Party Name:Five Star Cleaners Of Gilbert, L.L.C. v. DEYHIMI
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Final Order on Appeal]
    Date Published:July 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Certificate of Readiness to Transmit Record on Appeal to BAP]
    Date Published:May 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Designation of Additional Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Designation of Items to be Included in the Record on Appeal]
    Date Published:April 11, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Acknowledgment of Appeal by BAP]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Filing Fee Paid--Appeal]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Referral of Appeal and Transmittal to Bankruptcy Appellate Panel]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Appeal (298.00 fee)]
    Date Published:March 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Close Adversary]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Entry of Judgment / Order (Adv Form)]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oJudgment]
    Date Published:March 29, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Approve (Motion to)]
    Date Published:March 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Exhibits Intent to Dispose]
    Date Published:December 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Notice of Filing]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [oMemorandum/Opinion Decision]
    Date Published:October 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Correspondence]
    Date Published:August 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Pre-Trial Statement]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Order]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Minute Entry]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Lodging Proposed Order (Notice of)]
    Date Published:August 19, 2015
  • Filing Type:ap Office: 2 Chapter: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 20, 2014
  • Source: https://ecf.azb.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?683705
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =