open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:12-cv-08123
    Party Name:United States of America v. Colorado City, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:February 27, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [Substitute Attorney]
    Date Published:February 20, 2019
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Order]
    Date Published:June 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:December 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:November 09, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:October 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript - Appeal]
    Date Published:August 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Costs Taxed]
    Date Published:August 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request ]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Transcript Request]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request - Appeal]
    Date Published:August 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:August 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs - Obj/Ans/Resp]
    Date Published:July 31, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:July 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Representation Statement]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:July 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs ]
    Date Published:July 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Status]
    Date Published:July 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:July 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:June 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:June 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Permanent Injunction]
    Date Published:April 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Order ]
    Date Published:March 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:March 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lodged Proposed Document]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine ]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Evidentiary Hearing ]
    Date Published:October 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine ]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Compel ]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Expedite ]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Expedite ]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Compel]
    Date Published:August 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:July 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:June 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Reply]
    Date Published:June 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Response]
    Date Published:May 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Brief - Opening]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Approve Consent Judgment ]
    Date Published:April 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Approve Consent Judgment ]
    Date Published:April 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:March 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Verdict ]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Witness List]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Notes/Questions (Public Doc)]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document]
    Date Published:March 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Completed ]
    Date Published:March 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Verdict Form]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:February 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Held ]
    Date Published:January 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Jury Trial - Begun ]
    Date Published:January 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Quash ]
    Date Published:January 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Quash ]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:December 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Document ]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Seal Document ]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pretrial Conference - Final]
    Date Published:December 29, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Other]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum ]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF)]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Seal Document]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amend/Correct]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Trial Brief ]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Jury Instructions]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proposed Voir Dire]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 03, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Exhibit List]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Strike ]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:December 02, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike ]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?709886
Post Your Comment or Question
7 x 2 =