open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:15-cv-02236
    Party Name:Thornton v. Surprise, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:October 30, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 25, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs ]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Judgment]
    Date Published:October 10, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:September 27, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:November 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:November 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Strike ]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:September 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:April 19, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:January 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference ]
    Date Published:January 04, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:December 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion in Limine ]
    Date Published:December 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:November 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [In Limine ]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:October 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges ]
    Date Published:May 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Request ]
    Date Published:May 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript]
    Date Published:May 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Transcript Request]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request]
    Date Published:April 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:April 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue ]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?951998
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =