open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-cv-01304
    Party Name:Hunter et al v. Florence, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transcript Request - Appeal]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:November 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Lift Stay]
    Date Published:November 21, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines]
    Date Published:November 07, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:October 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:October 24, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reconsideration]
    Date Published:October 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:October 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Motion Hearing]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Set Oral Argument]
    Date Published:August 01, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:June 29, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:April 23, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Additional Attachments to Main Document]
    Date Published:February 20, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 16, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
    Date Published:January 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:September 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:September 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:September 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 17, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ]
    Date Published:June 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:May 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:May 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:April 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to File Document]
    Date Published:April 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Minute Entry]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Telephone Conference ]
    Date Published:February 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Errata]
    Date Published:January 26, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:December 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:October 20, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:October 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document ]
    Date Published:September 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Continue ]
    Date Published:July 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Continue ]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response]
    Date Published:June 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Other]
    Date Published:June 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ]
    Date Published:April 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time to Complete Discovery ]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:April 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:April 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
    Date Published:April 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Protective Order ]
    Date Published:March 31, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Discovery Hearing ]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:March 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:January 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:November 20, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?867722
Post Your Comment or Question
4 x 3 =