open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:15-cv-01696
    Party Name:Markham v. Surprise, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Attorney Fees ]
    Date Published:November 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings ]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs ]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Memorandum ]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Attorney Fees]
    Date Published:July 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:July 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Withdraw as Attorney ]
    Date Published:May 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:March 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:February 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Settlement Conference]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Appoint]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appoint ]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:December 04, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:December 01, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:November 23, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?940530
Post Your Comment or Question
2 x 1 =