open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:14-cv-02123
    Party Name:Candelaria et al v. Tolleson, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Mandate]
    Date Published:December 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Appeal Document (Other)]
    Date Published:February 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [USCA Case Number]
    Date Published:August 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Costs Taxed]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Appeal]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs ]
    Date Published:July 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:July 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Attorney Withdrawal (No Longer with Firm Only)]
    Date Published:April 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remark (Public) ]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Leave to File ]
    Date Published:February 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:January 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Leave to File Document ]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Objection]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Other]
    Date Published:November 30, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?884319
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =