open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:15-cv-01933
    Party Name:SurgCenter of Gilbert LLC v. UnitedHealthcare of Arizona Incorporated
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:May 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:April 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Status]
    Date Published:April 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Change of Address/Firm Name (Attorney)]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:December 17, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:November 27, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:November 25, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:November 24, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?945199
Post Your Comment or Question
1 x 3 =