open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:15-cv-02500
    Party Name:Large v. Mammoth, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Settlement]
    Date Published:October 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:September 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:August 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Vacate Hearing ]
    Date Published:July 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss Counts/Claims ]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:June 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Counts/Claims]
    Date Published:January 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Filing - Amended Pleading (LRCiv 15.1(b))]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Extension of Time ]
    Date Published:December 16, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Extension of Time]
    Date Published:December 15, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened ]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:December 08, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?956126
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 1 =