open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:15-cv-02518
    Party Name:Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors of Gilbert Hospital LLC v. Gilbert Hospital
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Civil Case ]
    Date Published:February 29, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
    Date Published:February 24, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:February 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Certificate of Readiness]
    Date Published:January 26, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Pro Hac Vice Fee Paid]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Admission Pro Hac Vice ]
    Date Published:January 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:January 11, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Consolidate Cases]
    Date Published:January 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:December 28, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 23, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deficiency re Corporate Disclosure Statement]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Receipt of Matter/Appeal]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Filing Type:Civil [Transmittal of Appeal/Bankruptcy Matter]
    Date Published:December 10, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?956496
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 2 =