open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:10-cv-08105
    Party Name:Cooke et al v. Colorado City, Town of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Status]
    Date Published:July 07, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:April 24, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Supplement]
    Date Published:July 18, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Discovery ]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Show Cause ]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Hearing]
    Date Published:February 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Satisfaction of Judgment]
    Date Published:January 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:January 07, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:January 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:January 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Show Cause ]
    Date Published:December 14, 2015
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?532849
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =