open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:16-cv-00065
    Party Name:McClarty v. Tolleson, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Costs Taxed]
    Date Published:August 08, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Bill of Costs ]
    Date Published:July 19, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment ]
    Date Published:July 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response to Motion for Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:September 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions]
    Date Published:August 15, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Statement of Facts]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Summary Judgment]
    Date Published:August 14, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Deposition]
    Date Published:May 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:November 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Hearings]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Remand to State Court ]
    Date Published:November 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:November 04, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Remand to State Court ]
    Date Published:October 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:September 30, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:September 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:March 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation]
    Date Published:February 22, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Reply to Response to Motion]
    Date Published:February 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Response in Opposition to Motion]
    Date Published:February 02, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
    Date Published:January 19, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:January 13, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened ]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Service Executed]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:January 12, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?960483
Post Your Comment or Question
8 x 3 =