U.S. Federal Court Records for the District of Arizona

arizona Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Federal Court for the District of Arizona
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:11-bk-01927-
  • Case Name: GANNON K GIGUIERE
  • Filing Type: Federal
Filing History
August, 2017
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Close Bankruptcy Case (ALL)]
  • August 16, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Final Report - Converted/Transferred Case (Chapter 13) (batch)]
July, 2017
  • July 23, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [BNC Certificate of Notice]
  • July 20, 2017: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Case Reviewed (Trustee Memo Form)]
May, 2016
  • May 31, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Case Reviewed (Trustee Memo Form)]
April, 2016
  • April 29, 2016: bk Office: 2 Chapter: 7 Trustee: MACKENZIE, ROBERT A. [Case Reviewed (Trustee Memo Form)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.