open-public-records

U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:18-cr-08140-1
    Party Name:USA v. Massey
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions ]
    Date Published:April 16, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions ]
    Date Published:April 15, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Procedural Interval Start]
    Date Published:March 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Expedite]
    Date Published:March 14, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Expedite ]
    Date Published:March 13, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Amended Minute Entry]
    Date Published:February 01, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Lodged Plea Agreement]
    Date Published:January 29, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Vacate Hearing]
    Date Published:January 25, 2019
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 13, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial and Extend Time to File Pretrial Motions]
    Date Published:September 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Admit/Deny Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Admit/Deny Hearing]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - FPD]
    Date Published:July 11, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment/Information/Complaint (Sealed - Unredacted)]
    Date Published:April 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Judgment and Commitment Issued/Judgment of Probation Issued]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Location Start]
    Date Published:February 26, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:January 17, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Time Change Only - Hearing]
    Date Published:January 12, 2018
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Financial Affidavit - CJA 23]
    Date Published:November 22, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Sentencing]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Sentencing ]
    Date Published:November 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Sentencing and/or Disposition Memorandum]
    Date Published:November 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:September 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:September 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued]
    Date Published:August 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings re Admissions/Pleas]
    Date Published:July 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Plea Agreement ]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Plea Entered (Guilty)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Change of Plea Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant & Order of Referral]
    Date Published:July 13, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Change of Plea Hearing ]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Set Change of Plea Hearing ]
    Date Published:July 10, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Status Conference (Text Only)]
    Date Published:June 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue ]
    Date Published:June 21, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order]
    Date Published:June 12, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Executed]
    Date Published:June 01, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Minute Order]
    Date Published:May 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:March 30, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order/Judgment Revoking Supervised Release]
    Date Published:March 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Final Disposition Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:March 27, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Adopting MJ Findings and Recommendation]
    Date Published:March 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Application for Writ]
    Date Published:March 20, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Response to Motion]
    Date Published:March 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
    Date Published:March 02, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Miscellaneous Relief]
    Date Published:February 28, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Dispositional Hearing]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Dispositional Hearing ]
    Date Published:February 16, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:January 25, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Withdraw as Attorney]
    Date Published:January 23, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Magistrate Judge Findings & Recommendation]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Admit/Deny Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Consent of Defendant for Hearing Before a Magistrate Judge]
    Date Published:January 18, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Warrant Returned Executed]
    Date Published:January 06, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order of Detention]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Preliminary Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 05, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance - Revocation Proceedings (Text Only)]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arrest]
    Date Published:January 03, 2017
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order on Motion to Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Continue Trial and Plea Deadline]
    Date Published:December 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Arraignment (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Detention Hearing (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Initial Appearance (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys ]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:November 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Summons Returned Executed]
    Date Published:November 09, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Indictment]
    Date Published:October 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA]
    Date Published:June 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Criminal [Notice of Related Case]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?724001
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 3 =