open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

ARIZONA PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Last Name
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:2:16-cv-01706--JZB
    Party Name:Bruno v. Goodyear, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Mail Returned]
    Date Published:November 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Clerks Judgment]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Motion to Dismiss ]
    Date Published:October 21, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Dismiss Case]
    Date Published:September 28, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Amended Complaint]
    Date Published:August 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Directing Prisoner Payment ]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Terminate Motions ]
    Date Published:July 25, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice (Other)]
    Date Published:June 23, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set Deadlines]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Clear Flags ]
    Date Published:June 10, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Assignment]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement ]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Complaint]
    Date Published:June 01, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?984476
Post Your Comment or Question
6 x 2 =