open-public-records

U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona

PUBLIC RECORDS SEARCH
First Name
Mi
Last Name
City
State
 
  • Court Name:U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Arizona
    Case Number:3:16-cv-08118
    Party Name:Burgess v. Kingman, City of et al
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order on Stipulation]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order Dismissing Case]
    Date Published:October 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Stipulation of Dismissal]
    Date Published:October 05, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Service of Discovery]
    Date Published:August 15, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Order]
    Date Published:August 08, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Scheduling Conference]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [1 - Common Prompts (Text Only)]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order re Rule 12(b) Motions]
    Date Published:August 03, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Report - Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Proposed Case Mgt Plan)]
    Date Published:July 27, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Agreement to Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction]
    Date Published:June 17, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Minute Order]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [25 Pct Mag - Election to Assign Case to District Judge]
    Date Published:June 16, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Answer to Complaint]
    Date Published:June 14, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [New Case Opened]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Filing Type:Civil [Notice of Removal]
    Date Published:June 06, 2016
  • Source: https://ecf.azd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/DktRpt.pl?985343
Post Your Comment or Question
3 x 3 =